PITT v. SALAMON et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gerald A Mchugh |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03206 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/28 9:13 AM
Notice of Election by WILLIAM PITT (mbh) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 08/27 8:25 AM
PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (mbh) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Fri 07/26 7:26 AM
Document #5 Mailed to Pro Se: William Pitt. (DT) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Pro Se Habeas Admin Order 3
Thu 07/25 9:30 AM
ORDER THAT PETITIONER HAVING FILED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2254 THAT WAS NOT FILED USING THE CURRENT STANDARD FORM. THE PETITION DOES NOT CONTAIN THE INSTRUCTIONS AND WARNINGS THAT ARE CONTAINED IN THE STANDARD FORM. IF PETITIONER INTENDS TO CONTINUE WITH THIS CASE AS FILED, PETITIONER IS DIRECTED TO RETURN THE NOTICE OF ELECTION FORM ATTACHED TO THIS ORDER. IF PETITIONER FAILS TO COMPLETE AND RETURN THE NOTICE OF ELECTION FORM TO THIS COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, THE COURT WILL RULE ON THE CURRENT PETITION, AS FILED. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/25/24. 7/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Wed 07/24 10:28 AM
DOC. NO.3 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 7/24/24. (amas) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 07/24 3:03 PM
Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 20022108 (sbt) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
Tue 07/23 2:47 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES (mbh) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 07/23 2:39 PM
MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FILED BY WILLIAM PITT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (mbh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 07/23 2:37 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FILED BY WILLIAM PITT. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP) (mbh) |