IN RE: DARREN PAYNE
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy Beetlestone |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03210 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 27, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case
Tue 08/27 12:11 PM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO AMEND THE CAPTION TO REFLECT THE FOLLOWING DEFENDANTS NAMED IN THE AMENDED COMPLAINT: (A) C/O ZIMMERMAN; (B) DR. LAUREL R. HARRY; (C) SGT. TIPPY; (D) UNIT MANAGER MS. MILLER; AND (E) C/O LOVE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/27/24. 8/27/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mas) |
|
utility
Case Transferred Out - District
Tue 08/27 12:18 PM
Case Transferred to U.S.D.C. FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. (mas) |
||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 08/23 9:37 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by DARREN PAYNE.(rf, ) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/25 1:33 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND PAYNE A BLANK COPY OF THE COURTS FORM COMPLAINT FOR A PRISONER FILING A CIVIL RIGHTS CASE, BEARING CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 7/23/24.7/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PAYNE WITH FORM.(rf, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Wed 07/24 10:24 AM
DOC. NO.3 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 7/24/24. (amas) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
Tue 07/23 7:38 AM
PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES (rf, ) |
|
2 | 2
trial
Exhibit
Tue 07/23 7:35 AM
SUMMONS by DARREN PAYNE.. (rf, ) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/23 7:34 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by DARREN PAYNE..(rf, ) |