Smith et al v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04067 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:24-cv-04073 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 5:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Plaintiff
Donald Springer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Troy Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorri Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorelle Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Sites
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allison Proctor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ella Prickett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Peters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bernadine Painter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Osgood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcel Yanez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Staggs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Suarez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Todeschini
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Turley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wanda Tyler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Vetri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Werth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Wilkinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erica Woods
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Audrey Wyatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cardell Wyatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vicki Eads
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Bader
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roberta Ball
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre Beckett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barry Belsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Bond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Brendle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonya Coardes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Coleman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Corey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Corlew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Daniels
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Davillier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonore Dietz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Middleton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shareese Feaster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Gardere
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Garlington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Hale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Niccole Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Hutchings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randolph Kricke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nichole Laquidara
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Candace Leonard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfreda Major
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Marinaccio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Needa McNeal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Melvin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 09/05 3:59 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rhei, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lanaye Peeples, Ruben Perez, Eric Perkins, David Pittman, Arthur Scott Fitton, Lawrence Esposito, Todd Fingerle, Juan Aleman II, Jack Carter, Joseph Anthony, Jacqueline Dugan, Christina Hall, John Bertrand, Mary Bingeman, Elijah Meredith, Ronda Mandel, Raymond Plunk, Lewis Scott Raines, Alan Foringer, Frank Brendle NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 07/23 12:05 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 7/22/2024), 1:24-cv-04073, Smith et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04067-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 07/23 11:49 AM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-04073. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/21/2024) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/23/2024.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/23/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, May 29, 2024 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/23/2024.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/23/2024.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/23/2024.] | ||
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/23/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet served on All Parties on 05/28/2024. Document filed by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company), Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually)..(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/23/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/23/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152339/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29408092).Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company), Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually), Chemguard Inc...(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/23/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - NY State Court Complaint |