161
|
|
161
3
pgs
notice
Notice
Mon 09/16 11:39 AM
Notice of Status Conference . Related [+] Filed by Barrow Shaver Resources Company, LLC (Wilson, Sean)
Related: [-] Hearing (Bk)
|
160
|
|
160
8
pgs
order
Emergency (Hearing)
Mon 09/16 11:22 AM
Final Order (I) Authorizing Continuation of Existing Cash Management System, Including Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts, Checks, and Business Forms, (II) Authorizing Continuation of Existing Deposit Practices, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+], Signed on 9/16/2024. (abm4)
|
159
|
|
159
19
pgs
order
Generic Order
Mon 09/16 11:20 AM
Stipulation and Order Governing the Production and Disclosure of Confidential Discovery Materials and Authorizing the Filing of Certain Documents Under Seal, Signed on 9/16/2024 Related [+] (abm4)
|
158
|
|
158
3
pgs
misc
Certificate of No Objection (Complex 11 ONLY)
Mon 09/16 9:39 AM
Certificate of No Objection to the Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Continuation of Existing Cash Management System, Including Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts, Checks, and Business Forms, (II) Authorizing Continuation of Existing Deposit Practices, and (III) Granting Related Relief (Filed By Barrow Shaver Resources Company, LLC ) Related [+] (Wilson, Sean)
|
| |
Att: 1
8 pgs
Proposed Order
|
|
|
court
Hearing Set
Mon 09/16 11:29 AM
Hearing Converted to Status Conference by Request Related [+] Parties contacted the case manager. Status conference to be held on 9/17/2024 at 02:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (ARP). (tjl4)
|
157
|
|
157
1
pgs
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Sat 09/14 8:22 AM
Order Granting Motion for Richard J. Bernard To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 9/14/2024. (abm4)
|
156
|
|
156
3
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 09/13 3:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael Duane Jones Filed by on behalf of New Dawn Energy 1.1, LLC, New Dawn Energy 1, LLC (Jones, Michael)
Related: [-]
|
155
|
|
155
1
pgs
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 09/13 3:29 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard J. Bernard (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number 25567586) Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Perry, Kristen)
Related: [-]
|
154
|
|
154
19
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/13 1:51 PM
Stipulation By Barrow Shaver Resources Company, LLC and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Barrow Shaver Resources Company, LLC ). (Wilson, Sean)
Related: [-]
|
153
|
|
153
5
pgs
notice
Notice
Fri 09/13 11:25 AM
Notice of Lien Perfection . Filed by DataLog Geological Services, LLC (Myles, Emma)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
70 pgs
Exhibit
|
152
|
|
152
4
pgs
misc
Exhibit List
Fri 09/13 10:58 AM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Barrow Shaver Resources Company, LLC ). (Wilson, Sean)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
15 pgs
Exhibit 1
|
| |
Att: 2
23 pgs
Exhibit 2
|
| |
Att: 3
2 pgs
Exhibit 3
|
| |
Att: 4
2 pgs
Exhibit 4
|
151
|
|
151
3
pgs
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 4:57 PM
Objection Related [+]. Filed by TLB Corporation (Curry, David)
|
150
|
|
150
4
pgs
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 4:51 PM
Objection SOS-LMC, LLC and The Scott Shaver Trust No. 2s Limited Objection to Final Order on Payment of Mineral Interest Claims Related [+]. Filed by SOS-LMC, LLC, Scott Shaver Trust No. 2 (Beatty, Jon)
|
149
|
|
149
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 09/12 4:48 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James Blake Hamm Filed by on behalf of Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC, Cactus Wellhead LLC, c/o Blake Hamm Princess Three Operating, LLC (Hamm, James)
Related: [-]
|
148
|
|
148
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 09/12 4:46 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Holly C Hamm Filed by on behalf of Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC, Cactus Wellhead LLC, c/o Blake Hamm Princess Three Operating, LLC (Hamm, Holly)
Related: [-]
|
147
|
|
147
12
pgs
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 4:29 PM
Objection Profrac Services, LLC's Objection to Entry of Final Order on Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Pay or Apply Payments Attributable to Mineral Interests in the Ordinary Course And (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Filed by ProFrac Services LLC (Hopkins, Katherine)
|
146
|
|
146
12
pgs
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 4:19 PM
Supplemental Objection to Debtor's Payments of Mineral Interests Related [+]. Filed by Axis Energy Services, LLC, Cudd Pressure Control, Inc., DOC Energy Services, LLC, Force Pressure Control, LLC, Genesis Fluids, LLC, Thru Tubing Solutions, Inc. (Rothberg, Lisa)
|
145
|
|
145
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 09/12 4:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Connor Smith Filed by on behalf of Axis Energy Services, LLC, Cudd Pressure Control, Inc., DOC Energy Services, LLC, Force Pressure Control, LLC, Genesis Fluids, LLC, Thru Tubing Solutions, Inc. (Smith, Connor)
Related: [-]
|
144
|
|
144
4
pgs
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 3:47 PM
Objection / Limited Objection to Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Pay or Apply Payments Attributable to Mineral Interests in the Ordinary Course and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Partnership Claimants and Brokers (English, Eric)
|
| |
Att: 1
2 pgs
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 2
2 pgs
Exhibit B
|
143
|
|
143
6
pgs
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 2:46 PM
Objection Limited Related [+]. Filed by Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC, c/o Blake Hamm Princess Three Operating, LLC, Cactus Wellhead LLC (Hamm, James)
|
142
|
|
142
5
pgs
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 1:42 PM
Objection to Final Order Authorizing Payment of Mineral Interests . Filed by Marion-Cass Development Company (Marmon, Shelley)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
3 pgs
Exhibit A
|
141
|
|
141
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 09/11 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 19. Notice Date 09/11/2024. (Admin.)
|
140
|
|
140
3
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 09/11 3:29 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Shelley B Marmon Filed by on behalf of Marion-Cass Development Company (Marmon, Shelley)
Related: [-]
|
139
|
|
139
2
pgs
notice
Notice
Wed 09/11 3:21 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Mineral Motion Scheduled for Hearing on September 17, 2024 . Related [+] Filed by Barrow Shaver Resources Company, LLC (Wilson, Sean)
Related: [-] Hearing (Bk) Cont
|
|
|
court
Hearing Cont
Wed 09/11 1:02 PM
Hearing Continued by Agreement Related [+] Parties contacted the case manager. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2024 at 01:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (ARP). (tjl4)
|
138
|
|
138
1
pgs
misc
AO435 Transcript Request
Tue 09/10 2:56 PM
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (Daily (24 hours)) by Cathy Greer. This is to order a transcript of 8/20/24 before Judge Judge Not Listed. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Veritext Legal Solutions (Filed By Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors ). (Perry, Kristen)
Related: [-]
|