Cocuzzi v. Reimann
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick J Schiltz |
Referred: | Douglas L Micko |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02876 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendation
Thu 09/05 5:00 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending Petitioner's1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied; this matter be dismissed; and no certificate of appealability be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 9/5/2024. (jme) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Receipt
Mon 07/29 10:46 AM
RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000754 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Petitioner Cocuzzi. (KMO) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter from Clerk's Office re: No Fee or IFP enclosing AO 239
Tue 07/23 8:52 AM
LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Michael Cocuzzi (jam) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 07/23 8:51 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Cocuzzi. Case assigned to Judge Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. (jam) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |