Bell v. Goodman Group
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine M Menendez |
Referred: | John F Docherty |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02883 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 3:50 AM CDT |
Defendant
Goodman Group
|
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Bell
2028 Grand Ave #21
St. Paul, MN 55105 |
GPO
Jul 24 2024
ORDER denying 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 7/24/2024. (RM) |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Docketing Correction
Thu 09/05 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for1 Complaint. Attached missing page to the complaint. (BTX) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/26 4:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathy Bell. Goodman Group served on 8/23/2024, answer due 9/13/2024. (CLK) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/02 10:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Goodman Group. (kt)cc: Bell with Service Information Sheet #2. (kt) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Receipt
Wed 07/31 12:52 PM
RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000757 in the amount of $405.00 issued to Kathy Bell. (KMO) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Wed 07/24 4:50 PM
ORDER denying2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 7/24/2024. (RM) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP)
Tue 07/23 11:02 AM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Kathy Bell. (jam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 11:02 AM
COMPLAINT against Goodman Group filed by Kathy Bell. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (jam) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |