Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.220.3.173
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick J Schiltz |
Referred: | Dulce J Foster |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02894 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.220.3.173
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Proposed Order to Judge re Motion
Mon 09/09 4:14 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re5 MOTION for Discovery Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
9 | 9
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Mon 09/09 4:13 PM
Declaration of Susan Stalzer in Support of5 MOTION for Discovery Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Mon 09/09 4:13 PM
Declaration of Patrick Paige in Support of5 MOTION for Discovery Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
7 | 7
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Mon 09/09 4:12 PM
Declaration of Jorge Arco in Support of5 MOTION for Discovery Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
6 | 6
17
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 09/09 4:11 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re5 MOTION for Discovery Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate | ||
5 | 5
motion
Discovery
Mon 09/09 4:10 PM
MOTION for Discovery Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 07/24 8:38 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/23 6:19 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Strike 3 Holdings LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (AO 121)
Tue 07/23 6:18 PM
REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (USCO noticed with filing.).(Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Works List | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 6:17 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.220.3.173 (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11213315) filed by Strike 3 Holdings LLC. No summons requested. (Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Works List, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |