Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.220.4.198
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick J Schiltz |
Referred: | Dulce J Foster |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02896 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.220.4.198
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 07/24 8:30 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 24-cv-2896 (PJS/DJF). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/23 6:29 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Strike 3 Holdings LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (AO 121)
Tue 07/23 6:28 PM
REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (USCO noticed with filing.).(Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Works List | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 6:27 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.220.4.198 (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11213332) filed by Strike 3 Holdings LLC. No summons requested. (Thompson, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Works List, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |