Kerr et al v. Hopkins Whittaker et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Jeffery S Frensley |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00891 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
Dina Hopkins Whittaker
|
|
Defendant
Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
State of Tennessee State of Tennessee
Office of the Tennessee Attorney General P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Lawrence Kerr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Jo Kerr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Intervene
Fri 09/06 11:58 AM
ORDER granting10 State Of Tennessees Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/6/2024. (sb) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/21 11:26 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by David Lawrence Kerr, Sandra Jo Kerr. Dina Hopkins Whittaker served on 8/21/2024. (Zager, Jeffrey) |
|
17 | 17
service
Alias Summons Issued
Wed 08/21 8:55 AM
ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dina Hopkins Whittaker. (kc) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 08/21 8:36 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Beth White, Mia K. Lazarini admitted to this court . (kc) |
||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Summons to be Issued
Tue 08/20 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Alias Summons to be Issued as to Dina Hopkins Whittaker. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Zager, Jeffrey) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Tue 08/20 5:31 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by David Lawrence Kerr, Sandra Jo Kerr as to Dina Hopkins Whittaker. (Zager, Jeffrey) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/20 3:18 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Schneider National Carriers, Inc..(White, Mary Beth) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/20 9:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mia K. Lazarini on behalf of Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Lazarini, Mia) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/20 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Beth White on behalf of Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (White, Mary Beth) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/09 10:46 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by David Lawrence Kerr, Sandra Jo Kerr. Schneider National Carriers, Inc. served on 7/30/2024.(Zager, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Post Office (Acceptance Confirmation) re Schneider National Carriers, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proof of Service Upon Schneider National Carriers, Inc. | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Intervene
Wed 08/07 11:39 AM
MOTION to Intervene by State of Tennessee. (Donica, Eric) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/26 2:32 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/26/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 8:12 AM
Summons issued as to Dina Hopkins Whittaker, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (kc) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Summons to be Issued
Tue 07/23 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons.(Zager, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Complaint | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Summons to be Issued
Tue 07/23 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Dina Hopkins Whittaker. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons.(Zager, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Complaint | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Tue 07/23 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/26/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ch) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Tue 07/23 1:34 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ch) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Tue 07/23 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ch) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Tue 07/23 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ch) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Tue 07/23 1:37 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jeffrey A. Zager, William T. Ramsey, Elizabeth Campbell Tirrill, Mark Allen Rassas, Mark Allen Rassas, Jr admitted to this court . (ch) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 1:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Dina Hopkins Whittaker, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4124987), filed by David Lawrence Kerr, Sandra Jo Kerr.(ch) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet |