In Re: Gunter
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Case #: | 3:24-mc-00007 |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Return of Service on Orders issued by Court
Wed 07/31 3:50 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE by USM re1 Order to Show Cause issued by the Court. (lh) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/30 4:58 PM
ORDER: Following the issuance of the Show Cause Order (Doc. No.1 ), the Court received additional information pertaining to the return of the jury summons. Accordingly, the hearing scheduled for Tuesday, August 13, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. The Clerk is directed to close this matter. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 07/30/24. (xc: A copy of this Order mailed to Danny Gunter to address provided on Order. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/23 10:42 AM
Juror Response to Grand Jury Summons. (mg) |
|
1 | 1
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 07/23 10:35 AM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER: Danny Gunter returned a Summons for Jury Service by writing "Go to Hell" in red ink. It is hereby ORDERED that DANNY GUNTER appear on Tuesday, August 13, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6-B, Fred Thompson United States Courthouse, 719 Church Street, Nashville, Tennessee, to show cause why he should not be held in contempt of court for his response to a Summons for Jury Service. It is further ORDERED that this show cause order be served upon said individual by the United States Marshals. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/22/2024. (mg) |
|
misc
Annotation - Docket
Tue 07/23 10:45 AM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER along with the Juror Response to Grand Jury Summons forwarded to the U.S. Marshals to effect service. (mg) |