Laurel et al v. County of Alameda et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Donna M Ryu |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04427 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 2:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
RN K. Brown
|
|
Defendant
County of Alameda
|
|
Defendant
RN Adiam Haile
|
|
Defendant
RN Laila Karim
|
|
Defendant
RN Shelby Moore
|
|
Defendant
PA Homayun Saleh
|
|
Defendant
Sheriff Yesenia Sanchez
|
|
Defendant
MD Asaad Traina
|
|
Defendant
Wellpath, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Minor A. L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Ann Laurel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Minor R. R.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/15 12:40 PM
Summons Issued as to K. Brown, County of Alameda, Adiam Haile, Laila Karim, Shelby Moore, Homayun Saleh, Yesenia Sanchez, Asaad Traina, Wellpath, LLC. (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 08/14 12:07 PM
Proposed Summons.(Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Attachment to Summons in a Civil Action Form | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Wed 08/14 9:38 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please resubmit ONE SUMMONS for ALL Defendants. List all the defendants in a separate sheet as attachment, if needed. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:6 Proposed Summons filed by R. R., A. L., Elizabeth Ann Laurel,13 Proposed Summons filed by R. R., A. L., Elizabeth Ann Laurel,11 Proposed Summons filed by R. R., A. L., Elizabeth Ann Laurel,12 Proposed Summons filed by R. R., A. L., Elizabeth Ann Laurel,9 Proposed Summons filed by R. R., A. L., Elizabeth Ann Laurel,10 Proposed Summons filed by R. R., A. L., Elizabeth Ann Laurel,8 Proposed Summons filed by R. R., A. L., Elizabeth Ann Laurel,14 Proposed Summons filed by R. R., A. L., Elizabeth Ann Laurel,7 Proposed Summons filed by R. R., A. L., Elizabeth Ann Laurel (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 08/13 4:34 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by A. L., Elizabeth Ann Laurel, R. R... (Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 08/13 4:21 PM
Proposed Summons. (Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 08/13 4:20 PM
Proposed Summons. (Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 08/13 4:19 PM
Proposed Summons. (Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 08/13 4:18 PM
Proposed Summons. (Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 08/13 4:14 PM
Proposed Summons. (Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 08/13 4:12 PM
Proposed Summons. (Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 08/13 4:08 PM
Proposed Summons. (Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 08/13 4:06 PM
Proposed Summons. (Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 08/13 4:03 PM
Proposed Summons. (Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 08/12 1:11 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 07/29 2:46 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 07/29 2:55 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please included Defendant's name and address on summons. If additional space is required use attachment. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by Elizabeth Ann Laurel (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 07/23 9:46 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/6/2024. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Schmidt, Sanjay) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19647191.). Filed by Elizabeth Ann Laurel.(Schmidt, Sanjay) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |