Ball et al v. Google LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04459 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 2:48 AM PDT |
Defendant
Google LLC
|
|
Defendant
YouTube, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Brandi Ball
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyran Haulcy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 11:15 AM
Summons Issued as to Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 07/24 10:33 AM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Wed 07/24 11:21 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filer is reminded to enter parties' names with the last name entered in the last name field and the first name in the first name field. 'individually and as successors-in-interest to Tahrique Haulcy ' should be entered in the party text field and not as part of the name. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:1 Complaint, filed by Brandi Ball. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 07/23 10:07 PM
Proposed Summons. (Marquez-Garrett, Laura) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 9:56 PM
COMPLAINT MASTER SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19651732.). Filed by Brandi Ball and Tyran Haulcy, individually and as successors-in-interest to Tahrique Haulcy.(Marquez-Garrett, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Create Case Association
Wed 07/24 9:18 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 4:22-md-03047-YGR. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/24 11:18 AM
DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 3047, Ball et al v. Google LLC et al, Opened in California Northern District as 24-cv-04459-YGR cc: JPMDL (mcl, COURT STAFF) |