Danley v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04460 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 2:48 AM PDT |
Defendant
ByteDance Inc.
ByteDance Inc. 1920 Olympic Blvd
Santa Monica, CA 90404 |
|
Defendant
ByteDance, Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Google LLC
|
|
Defendant
Instagram, LLC
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Siculus, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
TikTok, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
TikTok, LLC.
|
|
Defendant
TikTok, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
YouTube, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Monique Danley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 2:18 PM
Summons Issued as to ByteDance Inc., ByteDance, Ltd, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Google LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., TikTok, Inc., TikTok, LLC., TikTok, Ltd., YouTube, LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 07/24 10:04 AM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/7/2024. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 07/24 10:01 AM
***ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, MDL CASE FOR YGR - SEE DOC 4 *** Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/7/2024. (sec, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/24/2024 (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/24 2:19 PM
DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED RE MDL 3047: Monique Danley, individually and as successor-in-interest to Royce Griechen v. Meta Platforms, Inc., et al, Opened in California Northern District as 4:24-cv-04460-YGR cc: JPMDL (tn, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 07/23 10:41 PM
Proposed Summons.(Marquez-Garrett, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Attachment to Summons | ||
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 10:31 PM
COMPLAINT MASTER SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19651752.). Filed by Monique Danley, individually and as successor-in-interest to Royce Griechen.(Marquez-Garrett, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |