Lawrence v. Vantell
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00897 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Receipt
Tue 08/06 12:22 PM
RECEIPT #300003575 in the amount of $5 posted by Kevin Lawrence re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (kc) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Fri 07/26 9:21 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Taylor Michael Durrett admitted to this court . (am) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/25 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Michael Durrett on behalf of Vince Vantell (Durrett, Taylor) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Wed 07/24 10:07 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ch) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Wed 07/24 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ch) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 07/24 10:06 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kevin Lawrence. (filing fee not paid)(ch) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Cover Letter | ||
misc
Annotation - Docket
Wed 07/24 10:11 AM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.). (ch) |