STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 73.233.206.72
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03284 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 73.233.206.72
|
|
Plaintiff
STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Thu 08/22 10:32 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE (DOC. NO.4 ) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 8/22/24.8/22/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Discovery
Fri 08/16 12:45 PM
First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.Memorandum, Declarations, Certificate of Service.(ATKIN, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Jorge Arco, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Patrick Paige, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C -- Declaration of Susan Stalzer, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Copy of Copyright Form
Wed 07/24 2:19 PM
Copy of Form to Register of Copyrights. Mailed to U.S. Copyright Office (bw) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Wed 07/24 11:16 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.(ATKIN, JOHN) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Wed 07/24 11:16 AM
COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 73.233.206.72 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17622275.), filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.(ATKIN, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form |