WILLIAMS v. PHILADELPHIA, PA VETERANS AFFAIRS REGIONAL OFFICE
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kai N Scott |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03288 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, 220701211 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
PHILADELPHIA, PA VETERANS AFFAIRS REGIONAL OFFICE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RODNEY PAUL WILLIAMS
1221 Race Street
Philadelphia, PA 19107 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Thu 08/01 7:58 AM
COPY OF DOC. NO. 5 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 07/31 1:32 PM
ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME IS GRANTED AND THE UNITED STATES' RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE DUE NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 22, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 7/31/24.7/31/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE; E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 07/25 3:26 PM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT, AS RELATED TO WILLIAMS V. VETERANS ADMINISTRATOR REGIONAL OFFICE CIVIL NO. 24-3271 SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/24/24. 7/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE; E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
Wed 07/24 2:13 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sbt) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 07/24 1:26 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Notice of Removal (IFP or Government Filer) filed by PHILADELPHIA, PA VETERANS AFFAIRS REGIONAL OFFICE.Certificate of Service.(HANSEL, SARAH) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (IFP or Government Filer)
Wed 07/24 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PHILADELPHIA, PA VETERANS AFFAIRS REGIONAL OFFICE from Court of Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 220701211., filed by PHILADELPHIA, PA VETERANS AFFAIRS REGIONAL OFFICE.(HANSEL, SARAH) |
|
misc
Remark
Wed 07/24 2:15 PM
Pro Se Guidelines Mailed Out on 7/24/24. (sbt) |