8
|
|
8
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Answer Deadline
Tue 08/20 9:12 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 8/20/24 THAT THE CITY OF PHILADLEPHIA AND OFFICER LUIS CHAVEZ SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT DEFENDNATS' RESPONSES SHALL BE DUE ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 20, 2024. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/20/24. 8/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/14 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Edward Escobar on behalf of LUIS CHAVEZ, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA with Certificate of Service(Escobar, Raymond)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 08/05 11:06 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joseph Connelly re: served Summons and Complaint , Jury Demand, and Exhibits upon Officer Luis Chavez, Badge #3186 by Personal on Agent on 07/31/2024 (SHAPIRO, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 08/05 11:04 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joseph Connelly re: served Summons and Complaint ,Jury Demand, and Exhibits upon City of Philadelphia by Personal on Agent on 07/31/2024 (SHAPIRO, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/05 11:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUZANNE QUINN, MICHAEL QUINN, SR re: Joseph Connelly served Summons and Complaint upon CITY OF PHILADELPHIA by Personal Service on agent. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA served on 7/31/2024, answer due 8/21/2024. (SHAPIRO, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/05 10:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUZANNE QUINN, MICHAEL QUINN, SR re: Joseph Connelly served Summons and Complaint upon LUIS CHAVEZ by Personal Service on agent. LUIS CHAVEZ served on 7/31/2024, answer due 8/21/2024. (SHAPIRO, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 9:08 AM
Summons Issued as to LUIS CHAVEZ, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/26/24 (dt)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint (IFP or Government Plaintiff)
Thu 07/25 10:06 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SUZANNE QUINN, MICHAEL QUINN, SR (Filing Fee $405, APAEDC17622346) .(SHAPIRO, RICHARD) FILING FEE PAID, RECEIPT NO.: APAEDC-17622346. Modified on 7/25/2024 (sg). Modified on 7/25/2024 (sbt)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
cover sheet,
|
| |
Att: 2
designation form,
|
| |
Att: 3
exhibits
|
|
|
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Thu 07/25 11:44 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to pay the $405 Filing Fee. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to pay the $405 Filing Fee in this case using the Other Documents event under Other Filings. (sbt)
Related: [-]
|