Taunton v. Wal-Mart Inc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | David C Joseph |
Referred: | Kayla D Mcclusky |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00982 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 3rd JDC Union Parish, 51521 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
Wal-Mart Associates Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billie Janette Taunton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Saturday, July 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Sat 07/27 2:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Associates Inc, Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C.(aty,Wolf, Scott) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Response to Removal Order
Sat 07/27 11:57 AM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Wal-Mart Associates Inc, Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C . (aty,Wolf, Scott) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Sat 07/27 11:26 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Associates Inc, Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. for Wal-Mart Associates Inc; Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Inc. for Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (aty,Wolf, Scott) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Sat 07/27 11:18 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Associates Inc, Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (aty,Wolf, Scott) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Removal Order
Fri 07/26 3:15 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/26/2024. (crt,Williams, K) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Thu 07/25 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Maria A Losavio, Scott R Wolf on behalf of Billie Janette Taunton, Wal-Mart Associates Inc, Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 8/8/2024. (crt,Whitener, M) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Thu 07/25 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Scott R Wolf on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates Inc, Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/8/2024. (crt,Whitener, M) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Thu 07/25 9:58 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/25/2024. (crt,Whitener, M) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 07/24 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Removal from 3rd JDC Union Parish, Case Number 51,521 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6007255) filed by Wal-Mart Associates Inc, Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C.(Attorney Scott R Wolf added to party Wal-Mart Associates Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Scott R Wolf added to party Wal-Mart Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Scott R Wolf added to party Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Wolf, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/25 9:54 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Whitener, M) |