Stoltzfus v. O'MALLEY
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Craig M Straw |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-03294 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Social Security Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 08/19 1:19 PM
Social Security Notice of Case Assignment(er) |
|
Att: 1 Consent | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Procedural Order - Social Security
Thu 07/25 7:14 AM
Procedural Order 07/25/2024 Entered and copies e-mailed. (nd) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/25 7:12 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (DOC.2 ), LEAVE IS GRANTED; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK SHALL SERVE THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 3 OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. THE CLERK'S OFFICE WILL ENSURE THAT CM/ECF NOTIFICATIONS INDICATING THAT THE COMPLAINT HAS BEEN FILED, ARE SENT ELECTRONICALLY TO THE OFFICIAL EMAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATED BY THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION AND THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 07/24/2024.07/25/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/24 12:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joann Stoltzfus.In Forma Pauperis.(MARZZACCO, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (IFP or Government Plaintiff)
Wed 07/24 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT against MARTIN O'MALLEY, filed by Joann Stoltzfus.(MARZZACCO, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Case Management Tracking Form, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Designation Form, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Fully Favorable Decision, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit AC Remand, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Unfavorable Decision, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit AC Denial | ||
service
Service Event for Social Security Cases
Thu 07/25 7:12 AM
Service made electronically as to the Commissioner of Social Security and the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (nd) |