Smith v. F C I Pollock et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Joseph H L Perez-Montes |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00983 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 08/16 2:38 PM
FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Derek A Smith in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 500002993. (crt,Bowman, A) |
||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 08/09 3:47 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying5 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/9/2024. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/08 2:01 PM
MOTION for Immediate Transfer and Placement into RRC Halfway House or Home Confinement by Derek A Smith. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/6/2024.(crt,Taylor, L) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Sec P - Deficiency Order
Tue 07/30 3:31 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 8/28/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/29/2024.(crt,Williams, K) |
|
Att: 1 2241 Habeas form, | ||
Att: 2 In Forma Pauperis form | ||
3 | 3
order
Jurisdictional Review Finding
Mon 07/29 10:30 AM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 7/29/2024. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Fri 07/26 1:25 PM
PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/26/2024. (crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 07/24 1:52 PM
DEFICIENT PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Derek A Smith.(crt,Williams, G) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/24/2024) (Williams, G). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/24/2024) (Williams, G) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/26 1:20 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Devillier, W) |