Laurent v. United States Postal Service et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey M Bryan |
Referred: | Dulce J Foster |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02935 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle ( |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:17 AM CDT |
Defendant
Rachel Jean Gordon
|
|
Defendant
United States Postal Service
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlotte A. Laurent
15290 288th Ave. NW
Zimmerman, MN 55398 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail
Fri 07/26 11:34 AM
(Text-Only) Order: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b) and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Defendants'3 Request for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond on or before September 30, 2024 . To proceed in this action, Plaintiff must properly serve the Complaint as required under Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, failing which the Complaint may subject to dismissal for failure to properly serve it. The Court encourages Plaintiff to review this District's Representing Yourself webpage: https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/representing-yourself; this District's Pro Se Civil Guidebook: https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/sites/mnd/files/Pro-Se-Civil-Guidebook.pdf; this District's Local Rules: https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/sites/mnd/files/Local-Rules-Master.pdf; and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure: https://www.law.cornell.edu/rules/frcp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 7/26/2024.(JC) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 07/25 3:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Postal Service re3 Request (non-motion),4 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Rau, Kristen) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Order to Judge - Other
Thu 07/25 3:30 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re3 Request (non-motion). (Rau, Kristen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Request (non-motion)
Thu 07/25 3:27 PM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond by United States Postal Service. (Rau, Kristen) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 07/24 2:22 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 24-cv-2935 (JMB/DJF). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 07/24 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Sherburne - Tenth Judicial District, case number 71-CO-24-338 filed by United States Postal Service. No summons requested. (Rau, Kristen) |
|
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |