Jones - RESTRICTED - ACCEPT NO FILINGS v. Indiana Department of Correction et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Cristal C Brisco |
Referred: | Scott J Frankel |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00600 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/03 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglass R Bitner on behalf of Chico (Bitner, Douglass) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 08/14 3:55 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (nae) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/07 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanine Kerridge on behalf of Martin (Kerridge, Jeanine) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Opinion and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 08/06 8:17 AM
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING Pla until 9/20/2024, to pay all filing fees, have the restriction lifted, and file an amended complaint that addresses the deficiencies highlighted in this order; DIRECTING the clerk of court to return unfiled any non-defensive motions or other papers the Pla attempts to file in this lawsuit unless and until his filing restriction has been lifted; and CAUTIONING Pla that if he does not resolve his filing restrictions and file an amended complaint by the deadline, his federal claims will be dismissed without prejudice and any state law claims will be remanded to the state court. Signed by Judge Cristal C Brisco on 8/6/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lns) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/31 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carol A Dillon on behalf of Chico, Stephanie (Dillon, Carol) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/25 5:44 PM
**NEW CASE** Judge Cristal C Brisco and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (rmf) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/24 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander T Myers on behalf of All Defendants (Myers, Alexander) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 07/24 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BINNDC-5636276.) from LaPorte Circuit Court, Cause No. 46C01-2305-CT-000901, filed by Elizabeth Goodwin, Angela Castenda, Shamera Friday, Tiffany Lewis, Brittney White, Indiana Department of Correction, Sherman Day, Jonathan Hill, Christopher Dustin, Douglas Wardlow, Paige Finch, Callie Burke, Peter Craig, Jason Novak, Shawntay Gill, Nikki Mitchell, Kristi Ann Brown, Alisha Winn, Danielle Brown, Jaren Lynch, Terrie Garcia, Vicotria Wilcher Taylor, Kevin Cross, Barbara Standish, Adrianne Ball, Jeremy Stone, Michelle Lewis, Cassandra Guydon, Lacrese Smith, Katlynn Mann, Dennis Koen, Richard Arnold, Brandon Stovall, Tracy Walden, Ron Neal, Donna Carneygee, Marshall Sanders, Antonio Allmon, Donald Teague, Chelsea Gram, Nyjah Patterson, Ronald Anderson, Cindrea Vogel, Moses Itodo, Dujan Lott, Dawn Buss, Todd Marsh, Charles Wilson, William Frazier, Tonda Webb, Larry Haskell, Darnell Crockett, Gary Lewis.(Myers, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Copy of Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Copy of State Court Docket, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - State Court Filings - Part 1, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C - State Court Filings - Part 2, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C - State Court Filings - Part 3, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C - State Court Filings - Part 4, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit C - State Court Filings - Part 5, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit C - State Court Filings - Part 6, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit C - State Court Filings - Part 7, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit C - State Court Filings - Part 8, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit C - State Court Filings - Part 9, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit C - State Court Filings - Part 10, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit C - State Court Filings - Part 11 |