Quibodeaux v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | David C Joseph |
Referred: | Thomas P Leblanc |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00984 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
|
|
Plaintiff
Corina Quibodeaux
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/29 11:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corina Quibodeaux. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 7/26/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. (aty,Roach, Brooke) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/25 10:35 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Corina Quibodeaux. (aty,Roach, Brooke) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Wed 07/24 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Complaint, sent to Brooke A Roach on behalf of Corina Quibodeaux. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 8/7/2024. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
Wed 07/24 5:00 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/24 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6007576) filed by Corina Quibodeaux.(Attorney Brooke A Roach added to party Corina Quibodeaux(pty:pla))(aty,Roach, Brooke) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/24 4:57 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Miletello, A) |