Gayle v. Social Security
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Kayla D Mcclusky |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00985 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/30 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Simone Pereira Cain on behalf of U S Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Simone Pereira Cain added to party U S Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft)) (aty,Cain, Simone) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
appeal
Social Security Scheduling Order
Fri 07/26 1:22 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/26 11:26 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/26/2024. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
service
Service of Complaint on USA (Social Security)
Fri 07/26 1:19 PM
SERVICE of Complaint on the Commissioner of Social Security through the United States Attorney's Office by the Courts electronic case management system pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security actions Under 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g). U S Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/26/2024, answer due 9/24/2024. (crt,Miletello, A) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/24 3:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elizabeth Gayle. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/24/2024.(aty,Lemoine, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 In Forma Pauperis form, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/24 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Elizabeth Gayle.(Attorney Peter J Lemoine added to party Elizabeth Gayle(pty:pla))(aty,Lemoine, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/25 2:45 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Thomas, T) |