Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Brenda K Sannes |
Referred: | Mitchell J Katz |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00915 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Wed 08/14 11:54 AM
ORDER: Granting8 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, subject to the additional conditions set forth in Attachment "A." Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 4/12/2024. (kmc) |
|
9 | 9
14
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law
Wed 08/14 9:18 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW re8 Motion for Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Paige, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Arco, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Stalzer | ||
8 | 8
motion
Discovery
Wed 08/14 9:16 AM
MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2024 Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 08/14 9:15 AM
NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Third Party Early Discovery (James, Jacqueline) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Tue 08/13 3:34 PM
TEXT ORDER: Granting5 Letter Motion requesting leave to file a motion seeking leave to file a third-party subpoena pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) and adjourning any scheduled Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 8/13/2024. (kmc) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Discovery
Tue 08/13 12:16 PM
MOTION for Discovery Letter Motion Third Party Early Discovery filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2024 Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Notice of Potential Related Case
Wed 07/24 4:15 PM
TEXT ORDER: granting Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 7/24/2024. (nmk) |
|
3 | 3
misc
G.O. 25 Filing Order
Wed 07/24 3:46 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Date for Rule 16 Conference to be determined. (ham) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Copyright Report
Wed 07/24 3:46 PM
Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s) (ham) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/24 3:45 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6810444) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(ham) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 24 Works Infringed, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
motion
Notice of Potential Related Case for Judicial Review
Wed 07/24 3:47 PM
TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 1:22-cv-718 (BKS/ATB). (ham) |
||
notice
Text Notice Regarding John Doe Defendant (Text-Only)
Wed 07/24 3:48 PM
TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe defendant(s) in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summons(es) for service of process on a John Doe defendant(s) at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the John Doe defendant(s), plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant(s) pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons(es) will be issued at that time. (ham) |