MILLER v. MCGINLEY et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John R Padova |
Referred: | Mary Kay Costello |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03297 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Thu 08/29 7:58 AM
PAPER #8 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL) |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order for Prisoner State Record
Wed 08/28 2:30 PM
ORDER THAT THE THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY IS ADDED AS A PARTY RESPONDENT AND THE CAPTION IS HEREBY SO AMENDED. THE THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH VS MILLER, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA,CP-51-CR-0004971-2018 WITHIN 20 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. PRISONER STATE RECORD DUE BY 9/27/2024.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARY KAY COSTELLO ON 8/28/24. 8/28/24 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(JL) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/21 10:24 AM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE MARY KAY COSTELLO, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. ALL ISSUES AND EVIDENCE SHALL BE PRESENTED TO THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/21/24. 8/21/24 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(JL) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 08/20 3:21 PM
Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 20022879 (sbt) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 08/06 10:11 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED BECAUSE MILLER HAS SUFFICIENT FUNDS AVAILABLE IN HIS INMATE ACCOUNT TO PAY THE REQUIRED $5 FILING FEE. IF MILLER SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE SHALL REMIT $5 TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/6/24.8/6/24 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE.(JL) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
Wed 07/24 3:40 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES 7/24/24 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE(JL) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Wed 07/24 3:38 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by NATHANIEL MILLER. (JL) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 07/24 3:37 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (NO FEE PAID; IFP MOTION PENDING), filed by NATHANIEL MILLER.(JL) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/24 3:36 PM
NATHANIEL MILLER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS.(JL) |