Crenshaw v. O'Malley
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Alistair Newbern |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00901 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Mon 08/26 3:25 PM
IL State Bar status verified as active for Adam R. Sorkin admitted to this court . Local counsel waived. (kc) |
||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/21 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Sorkin on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Sorkin, Adam) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Good Standing
Thu 08/01 4:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Tiffany Laurens Ours from the United States District Court for the Middle of North Carolina filed by Penny Crenshaw. (lh) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/01 4:19 PM
MOTION for attorney Tiffany L. Ours to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Penny Crenshaw. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 08/01 8:47 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Commissioner is ORDERED to file a copy of the certified administrative record and an answer no later than 60 days after issuance of the Notice of Electronic Filing. Soc. Sec. R. 4(a). The certified administrative record may serve as the answer. Soc. Sec. R. 4(b). If the Commissioner files a motion under Rule 12, that motion must be filed no later than 60 days after issuance of the Notice of Electronic Filing. Soc. Sec. R. 4(c).After the Commissioner has filed an answer and the certified record, the action must be presented for decision by the parties' briefs. Soc. Sec. R. 5. The plaintiff is ORDERED to file a motion for judgment on the administrative record and an accompanying memorandum in support of the motion no later than thirty days after the certified administrative record and/or answer are filed. Soc. Sec. R. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 07/31/24. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
5
pgs
order
Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/30 10:39 AM
ORDER granting2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/30/2024. (mg) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Fri 07/26 11:59 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby RECUSE myself in the above-styled action. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign this matter to another Magistrate Judge for all future case management, including resolution of pending matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/26/2024. (kc) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Wed 07/24 2:14 PM
NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES ARISING UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) (am) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Wed 07/24 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (am) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/24 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Williamson on behalf of Penny Crenshaw. (am) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/24 2:12 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Penny Crenshaw. (am) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Social Security Complaint
Wed 07/24 2:11 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley, filed by Penny Crenshaw.(am) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 07/24 2:15 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael Patrick Williamson admitted to this court . (am) |