Westfield Insurance Company v. J&J Plumbing Services, LLC et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00899 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:38 AM CDT |
Defendant
J&B Plumbing
|
|
Defendant
J&J Plumbing Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Westfield Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Fri 08/30 8:25 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jacob E. Moses admitted to this court . (mg) |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/29 10:39 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by J&J Plumbing Services, LLC. (Ferrell, E.) |
|
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/29 10:38 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by J&J Plumbing Services, LLC.(Ferrell, E.) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 08/12 11:14 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, J&J Plumbing Services, LLC answer due 8/30/2024. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/2024. (ch) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 08/08 9:12 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for E. Jason Ferrell admitted to this court . (mg) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 08/07 3:09 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by J&J Plumbing Services, LLC. (Ferrell, E.) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/07 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by E. Jason Ferrell on behalf of J&J Plumbing Services, LLC (Ferrell, E.) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/31 11:34 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Babb, Edward) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/31 8:49 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Westfield Insurance Company. J&B Plumbing served on 7/26/2024. (Babb, Edward) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/31 8:47 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Westfield Insurance Company. J&J Plumbing Services, LLC served on 7/27/2024. (Babb, Edward) |
|
misc
Annotation - Deficiency Notice
Wed 07/31 8:34 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 8 , 9 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file the document. (mg) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 07/30 9:43 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint-Summons on J&J Plumbing Service served on Jason Savage, Owner on 07-27-24, filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Babb, Edward) |
|
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 07/30 9:33 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint-Summons served on Jose Hernundoz, Owner on 07-29-24, filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Babb, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/24 3:00 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Babb, Edward) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 2:54 PM
Summons issued as to J&B Plumbing, J&J Plumbing Services, LLC. (kc) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Wed 07/24 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 1/27/2025 at 02:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Wed 07/24 2:46 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Wed 07/24 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Wed 07/24 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/24 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT against J&B Plumbing, J&J Plumbing Services, LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4126676), filed by Westfield Insurance Company.(kc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Release for Property Damage Only, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 07/24 2:47 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Edward U. Babb admitted to this court . (kc) |