Warfield-Palmer v. 7-Eleven, Inc.
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00902 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:38 AM CDT |
Defendant
7-Eleven, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Paige Warfield-Palmer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 09/04 5:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Corporate Creations Network Inc. on 9/4/2024, filed by Paige Warfield-Palmer. (Forester, Jesse) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/26 2:55 PM
NOTICE by Paige Warfield-Palmer of Filing Additional Consent(Forester, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 3:17 PM
Summons issued as to 7-Eleven, Inc. (kc) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Wed 07/24 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 1/27/2025 at 02:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Wed 07/24 3:11 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Wed 07/24 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Wed 07/24 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/24 3:09 PM
COMPLAINT against 7-Eleven, Inc. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number Case: 3:24cv00902 , filed by Paige Warfield-Palmer.(kc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 07/24 3:13 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins admitted to this court . (kc) |
||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 07/24 3:14 PM
TX State Bar status verified as active for Jesse H. Forester admitted to this court . Local counsel secured. (kc) |