Kakowski
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Referred: | Pslc Llh |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04469 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 13, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/13 2:03 PM
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE/TERMINATE ACTION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/13/2024. (ls, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 08/12 1:45 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 08/12/2024.(mbc, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 08/12 11:56 AM
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/12/2024. (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/08 2:46 PM
NOTICE of misunderstanding by Brian Kakowski. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Tue 08/06 8:59 AM
Letter from Brian Kakowski.(mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Mon 08/05 2:28 PM
Letter from Brian Kakowski. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Mon 08/05 2:05 PM
Letter from Brian Kakowski. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
utility
Remark
Fri 07/26 7:42 PM
REMAILED Clerk's Notices2 ,3 ,4 to plaintiff at RJD.(ljf, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
utility
Remark
Thu 07/25 10:40 AM
Corrected typo in plaintiff's prisoner number on docket.(ljf, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
oth_evt
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/25 2:40 PM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
3 | 3
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: IFP
Wed 07/24 2:48 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/3/2024. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
2 | 2
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice to File Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint/Habeas Petition on Form
Wed 07/24 2:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 9/3/2024. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Letter
Wed 07/24 2:41 PM
Letter from Brian Kakowski.(mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits - Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits - Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibits - Part 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibits - Part 4, | ||
Att: 5 Envelope |