Garner v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Nancy E Brasel |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02941 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:18 AM CDT |
Defendant
Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Garner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 09/04 10:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Barbara Garner. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The waiver sent on 8/2/2024, answer due 10/1/2024. (Mohamed, Caitlin) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/25 12:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (CLK) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 07/25 12:39 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-2941 NEB/DTS. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Exhibit/Exhibit List (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings)
Thu 07/25 12:34 PM
EXHIBIT A re1 Complaint, filed by Barbara Garner. (Mohamed, Caitlin) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/25 12:26 PM
COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11218608) filed by Barbara Garner. Filer requests summons issued. (Mohamed, Caitlin) Modified text on 7/25/2024 (CLK) |
|
Att: 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |