KHAN v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03314 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
JOYCE KHAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 8:32 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. (rf, ) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Thu 07/25 9:34 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3314. (sbt) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
63
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Wed 07/24 5:54 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17623947.), filed by JOYCE KHAN.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |