Jackson et al v. Ortiz et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Referred: | Barbara D Holmes |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00900 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:38 AM CDT |
Defendant
MJC Express, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eddy Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ponce's Xpress, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
De'ante Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyesha Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Kindle
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Tue 08/27 8:50 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Andrew Gardella admitted to this court . (kc) |
||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Tue 08/27 8:53 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Earl W. Houston, II admitted to this court . (kc) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/26 4:36 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Eddy Ortiz.(Gardella, Andrew) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 08/26 4:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Negligence Per Se Claims and Punitive Damages Claims by Eddy Ortiz.(Gardella, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Eddy Ortiz's Motion to Dismiss Negligence Per Se Claims and Punitive Damages Claims | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/12 3:20 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Kyesha Jackson, Deborah Kindle, De'ante Jackson. MJC Express, Inc. served on 8/5/2024. (Tanner, James) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/12 12:06 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Kyesha Jackson, Deborah Kindle, De'ante Jackson. Eddy Ortiz served on 8/5/2024. (Tanner, James) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/05 1:57 PM
ORDER granting9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Leila H. Watson to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 08/05/2024. (lh) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Mon 08/05 10:50 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for James Curtis Tanner admitted to this court . (kc) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/01 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Curtis Tanner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tanner, James) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/01 10:54 AM
MOTION for attorney Leila H. Watson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4132558) by De'ante Jackson, Kyesha Jackson, Deborah Kindle. (Watson, Leila) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Thu 07/25 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2025 at 03:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (sb) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 07/25 10:38 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Frank Jerome Tapley, Hamilton G. Jordan admitted to this court . (sb) |
||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 07/25 10:39 AM
AL State Bar status verified as active for Leila H. Watson not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (sb) |
||
misc
Annotation - PHV
Thu 07/25 10:40 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Leila H. Watson: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/15/2024. (sb) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/25 10:23 AM
Summons issued as to Ponce's Xpress, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (sb) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/25 10:23 AM
Summons issued as to MJC Express, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (sb) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/25 10:22 AM
Summons issued as to Eddy Ortiz. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (sb) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Thu 07/25 10:21 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Thu 07/25 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (sb) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Thu 07/25 10:20 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/24 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT against MJC Express, Inc., Eddy Ortiz, Ponce's Xpress, Inc. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4126714), filed by Kyesha Jackson, Deborah Kindle, De'ante Jackson.(sb) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet |