6
|
|
6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/20 8:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dilbag Rai. Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 8/1/2024, answer due 8/22/2024; Ted H. Kim served on 8/1/2024, answer due 8/22/2024; Danielle Lehman served on 7/29/2024, answer due 8/19/2024; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 7/29/2024, answer due 8/19/2024; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 8/1/2024, answer due 8/22/2024; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 8/2/2024, answer due 8/23/2024.(Prescott, Pamela)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 07/25 11:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Danielle Lehman, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order
Thu 07/25 10:55 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/25 10:45 AM
Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 07/24 3:57 PM
Proposed Summons. (Kazerounian, Seyed)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/24 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Danielle Lehman, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19655633.). Filed by Dilbag Rai.(Kazerounian, Seyed)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2,
|
| |
Att: 3
Civil Cover Sheet
|