Major v. Vantapro Specialty Insurance Co
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Dee D Drell |
Referred: | Joseph H L Perez-Montes |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00986 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Calcasieu Parish, 24-02082 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
Vantapro Specialty Insurance Co
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnathan Major
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel
Thu 09/05 4:37 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel John Lee Hoffoss, Jr,Douglas Cooper Fournet,Joseph P Norman,Max Emile Guthrie for Johnathan Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/5/2024. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Enroll as Counsel
Wed 08/28 1:34 PM
MOTION for J. Lee Hoffoss, Jr.; D. Cooper Fournet; Joseph P. Norman and Max Guthrie to Enroll as Counsel by Johnathan Major. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/28/2024.(aty,Ackley, Keifer) |
|
Att: 1 Text of proposed order | ||
11 | 11
misc
Response to Removal Order
Wed 08/28 10:59 AM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Vantapro Specialty Insurance Co .(aty,Gjertson, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court | ||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/31 11:45 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Vantapro Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Gjertson, Alexandra) Modified docket text on 7/31/2024 (Miletello, A) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/31 11:42 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vantapro Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Gjertson, Alexandra) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/31 11:40 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vantapro Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Ltd, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Holdings U S Inc, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Holdings Ireland Ltd, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Co Ltd, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Co Holdings Ltd, Corporate Parent Allied World Specialty Insurance Co, Corporate Parent Allied World Insurance Co, Corporate Parent 1102952 B C Unlimited Liability Co, Corporate Parent O C M Goldfish Inc, Corporate Parent O M E R S Administration Corp, Corporate Parent A W Underwriters Inc, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Co Holdings I Ltd for Vantapro Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Gjertson, Alexandra) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Case Management Order - Judges Drell, Doughty, James ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 07/30 1:28 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 9/22/2024.)(crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Removal Order
Mon 07/29 1:42 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 7/29/2024. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
5 | 5
order
Jurisdictional Review Finding
Mon 07/29 10:31 AM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 7/29/2024. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Fri 07/26 10:45 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/24/2024. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Fri 07/26 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Keifer Grey Ackley, Alexandra Leigh Gjertson on behalf of Johnathan Major, Vantapro Specialty Insurance Co. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 8/7/2024. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Fri 07/26 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Keifer Grey Ackley, Alexandra Leigh Gjertson on behalf of Johnathan Major, Vantapro Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/7/2024. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 07/24 5:31 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2024-2082 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6007943) filed by Vantapro Specialty Insurance Co.(Attorney Alexandra Leigh Gjertson added to party Vantapro Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Gjertson, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A State Court Record, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B LDI Details re VSIC, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C VSIC Policy Declarations | ||
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Fri 07/26 10:36 AM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Vantapro Specialty Insurance Co answer due 7/31/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY:The PDF image can be found in Attachment # 2 to Doc1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Chavis, J) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/26 10:38 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Chavis, J) |