Chittim et al v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04483 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 2:51 AM PDT |
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Instagram, LLC
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Siculus, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Snap, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Chittim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Chittim
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/25 3:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap, Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/25 8:09 AM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Thu 07/25 3:05 PM
DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 3047: Opened in California Northern District as 4:24-cv-04483-YGR, Chittim et al v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al cc: JPMDL (krp, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 07/24 5:44 PM
Proposed Summons.(Marquez-Garrett, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Attachment to Summons | ||
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/24 5:43 PM
COMPLAINT MASTER SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19656154.). Filed by Samuel Chittim, Jessica Chittim.(Marquez-Garrett, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |