California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:24-cv-06253
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 12:31 AM PST
Defendant
Palestinian Youth Movement
Defendant
WesPac Foundation
Represented By
Mark A. Kleiman
Kleiman Rajaram
contact info
Robert L. Herbst
Herbst Law PLLC
contact info
Ramsey Judah
Judah Law Group, Lc
contact info
Defendant
CodePink Action Fund
Defendant
CodePink Women for Peace
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Honor the Earth
Defendant
Remo Ibrahim
Defendant
Courtney Lenna Schirf
Plaintiff
StandWithUs Center for Legal Justice
Represented By
Jason B Torchinsky
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky And Josefiak, PLLC
contact info
Daniel Raphael Paluch
Gipson Hoffman And Pancione Apc
contact info
Erielle Davidson
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky And Josefiak, PLLC
contact info
Dallin B. Holt
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
contact info
Bencion Schlager
National Jewish Advocacy Center
contact info
John J. Cycon
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky And Josefiak, PLLC
contact info
Edward M Wenger
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky And Josefiak PLLC
contact info
Mark Goldfeder
National Jewish Advocacy Center Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Noah Pollak
Represented By
Daniel Raphael Paluch
Gipson Hoffman And Pancione Apc
contact info
Dallin B. Holt
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CodePink
Terminated: 12/19/2024
Represented By
Mark A. Kleiman
Kleiman Rajaram
contact info
Collin Poirot
Collin Poirot Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
128 128 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/22 3:39 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE-IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant125 - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing scheduled for 04/28/2025 at 1:30 P.M. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]