Kirkland v. Burkett et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Theresa L Springmann |
Referred: | John E Martin |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00599 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appoint Counsel
Thu 08/29 12:05 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Martize Kirkland.(kmt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Docket Annotation - public event with NEF
Thu 08/22 3:21 PM
Letter to Martize Kirkland #192455 in response to10 Notice of future address change. (kmt) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 08/22 3:15 PM
NOTICE of FUTURE Change of Address by Martize Kirkland (kmt) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 08/22 3:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Centuerion Health, Chad C Crites, Lee Ivers, Margaret Keller, Beverly A. Marshall, filed by Martize Kirkland.(kmt) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 08/15 9:22 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the relief requested in Plaintiffs letter7 . The Court EXTENDS the deadline for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint to 9/26/2024. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to place this case number on a blank prisoner complaint form and send it to the Plaintiff, along with a copy of his earlier-filed complaint1 . The Court DENIES any other relief he requests in his letter7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 8/14/2024.(sej) |
|
Att: 1 Previously Docketed Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Blank Complaint Form with Case Number | ||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Mon 08/12 4:17 PM
Letter from Martize Kirkland requesting extension of time, copy of complaint from case 324cv286, and blank forms. (nae) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 07/26 3:06 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis3 ; ORDERS the Plaintiff, Martize Kirkland, IDOC # 192455, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $12.66 to the Clerk of Court in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the Plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the Clerk of Court 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this order to each facility where the Plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 7/25/2024. (cc: Westville C.F.)(ash) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Opinion and Order Order Striking Document ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 07/26 3:02 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court STRIKES the complaint1 ; GRANTS the Plaintiff until 8/26/2024, to file an amended complaint as outlined; and CAUTIONS him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case is subject to dismissal without further notice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 7/25/2024. (ash) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/26 11:27 AM
ORDER (from 3:24-cv-286 case): The court SEVERS the amended complaint (ECF 23), the consent to electronic filing (ECF 24), and the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF 25) and DIRECTS the clerk to open a new case with these filings; and DENIES any other relief requested in the plaintiffs letters (ECF 21, 22). Signed by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 7/22/2024. (sej) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/24 12:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Martize Kirkland. (Filed as ordered from case 3:24-cv-286, DE 26)(sej) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
2 | 2
misc
Consent to Prisoner E-Service
Wed 07/24 12:50 PM
Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Martize Kirkland. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (sej) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Pro Se Complaint
Wed 07/24 12:49 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Charlene A Burkett, Centuerion Health, Chad C Crites, Brian English, Michael Gapski, C Harbough, Lee Ivers, Margaret Keller, Beverly A. Marshall, filed by Martize Kirkland. (Filed as ordered from case 3:24-cv-286, DE 26)(sej) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |