McMahon v. Nathan Littauer Hospital
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Anne M Nardacci |
Referred: | Miroslav Lovric |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00908 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
Nathan Littauer Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrice McMahon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/26 3:53 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nathan Littauer Hospital identifying Corporate Parent Colonial Healthcare Corporation for Nathan Littauer Hospital.. (DeSoyza, Sanjeeve) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/26 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hilda Marinello Curtin on behalf of Nathan Littauer Hospital (Curtin, Hilda) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/26 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sanjeeve K. DeSoyza on behalf of Nathan Littauer Hospital (DeSoyza, Sanjeeve) |
|
misc
Text Notice of Filing Deficiency
Tue 08/27 8:47 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Nathan Littauer Hospital regarding the10 Notice of Appearance NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney address contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 8/29/2024 (sbb) |
||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Thu 08/08 12:51 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #6 Amended Complaint: Redacted copy of the amended complaint has been uploaded and attached to #6 and are available for public viewing. The unredacted copy of the amended complaint is now permanently restricted pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 5.2 and NYND Local Rule 5.2. (sbb) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 08/07 3:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint served on Nathan Littauer Hospital on August 7, 2024, filed by Patrice McMahon. (Luibrand, Kevin) |
|
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 08/07 3:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint and General Order #25 served on Nathan Littauer Hospital on July 26, 2024, filed by Patrice McMahon. (Luibrand, Kevin) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 08/07 2:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nathan Littauer Hospital filed by Patrice McMahon.(Luibrand, Kevin) |
|
misc
Text Notice of Filing Deficiency
Thu 08/08 10:04 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Patrice McMahon regarding the6 Amended Complaint NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has submitted documents that are not in compliance with redaction requirements pursuant to Federal and NYND Local Rules 5.2 Personal Privacy Protection and General Order 22, Section 11.2. This document has been TEMPORARILY RESTRICTED. Counsel is directed to make the appropriate redactions to the above referenced document and electronically file the redacted document within 3 days of this notice using the event CORRECTED DOCUMENT(S) found under Other Filings and reference this case number. Do NOT use any other event to file your corrected document. Failure to file a redacted document by the deadline will result in the unredacted document referenced above being unrestricted. Counsel and the parties are cautioned that failure to redact these personal identifiers may subject them to the Courts full disciplinary power pursuant to NYND Local Rule 5.2. Date of Birth is in the Amended Complaint Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 8/12/2024 (sbb) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadlines
Fri 08/02 11:21 AM
ORDER granting4 Stipulation for an extension of time to respond. Defendant Nathan Littauer Hospital's response is now due on or before 9/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/2/2024. (jdc ) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/01 3:26 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint requesting extension of time to answer or move by Nathan Littauer Hospital submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric. (DeSoyza, Sanjeeve) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
G.O. 25 Filing Order
Wed 07/24 11:30 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 10/23/2024 at 01:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/16/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sbb) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 11:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Nathan Littauer Hospital. (sbb) |
|
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 07/24 11:53 AM
TEXT NOTICE: The Initial Conference scheduled for 10/23/2024 at 1:30PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, will be held via Microsoft Teams Teleconference. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/24 11:29 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Nathan Littauer Hospital (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6809515) filed by Patrice McMahon.(sbb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |