USA v. Jimenez-Cruz
Texas Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 7:24-cr-01022 |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 2:24 AM CDT |
Defendant
Elthon Jimenez-Cruz (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/25/2024 3:18 AM CDT |
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
Arrest of Ethon Jimenez-Cruz, filed. (cb7) [7:24-mj-01056] | ||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis. 8:1326 INITIAL APPEARANCE and PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION on Criminal Complaint as to Ethon Jimenez-Cruz held on 6/27/2024. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Deft, through counsel, waived Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing. Court found Probable Cause. Deft held without bond. Due Process Protections Act admonishments provided to Counsel by Court. Appearances: Lee Alfred Fry, AUSA; Yvonne Gomez, AFPD. (PTS: Robert Weaver) (ERO: Stephanie Garcia) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Nicholas Gibler/used) (DUSM: Lorenzo Billescas) Deft remanded to custody. (nc7) [7:24-mj-01056] | ||
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Miroslava Alexis Garcia appearing for USA, filed. (Garcia, Miroslava) [7:24-mj-01056] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT as to Ethon Jimenez-Cruz (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 6/27/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis (cb7) (ced7). [7:24-mj-01056] | |
2 | 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Ethon Jimenez-Cruz, filed. (cb7) [7:24-mj-01056] | |
3 | 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Ethon Jimenez-Cruz (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-01056] | |
4 | 4 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Ethon Jimenez-Cruz. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-01056] | |
5 | 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Ethon Jimenez-Cruz. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-01056] | |
6 | 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Ethon Jimenez-Cruz, filed. [7:24-mj-01056] | |
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Ethon Jimenez-Cruz, filed. (jap7) [7:24-mj-01056] | |
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Elthon Jimenez-Cruz (1) count(s) 1, filed. (jen7) | |
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment | ||
9 | 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Elthon Jimenez-Cruz, filed. (jen7) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/24/2024) (jen7). | |
10 | 10 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Elthon Jimenez-Cruz. Arraignment set for 8/1/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker, filed. (jen7) |