Watkins v. Concentra Health Services, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-04452 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Santa Clara County Superior Court, 24CV440957 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 2:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
Concentra Health Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Latoya Watkins
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 08/05 3:03 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Concentra Health Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Select Medical Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Concentra Group Holdings Parent, Inc. for Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Fitzsimmons, Marcie) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 08/05 2:59 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Concentra Health Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Select Medical Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Concentra Group Holdings Parent, Inc. for Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Fitzsimmons, Marcie) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 08/05 8:22 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Latoya Watkins.. (Waelty, Joel) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 08/05 9:32 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. Re:7 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc.,8 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc. (jml, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 08/02 3:09 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Concentra Health Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Select Medical Holdings Corporation for Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Fitzsimmons, Marcie) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 08/02 3:03 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Concentra Health Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Select Medical Holdings Corporation for Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (Fitzsimmons, Marcie) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 08/02 2:46 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Concentra Health Services, Inc... (Fitzsimmons, Marcie) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 07/31 6:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Concentra Health Services, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, (Fitzsimmons, Marcie) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 07/25 12:12 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2024 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/25 11:01 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/8/2024. (kxo, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Wed 07/24 5:14 PM
AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by Concentra Health Services, Inc.. Amendment to Electronic Filing Error,, CIVIL COVER SHEET . (Fitzsimmons, Marcie) Modified on 7/25/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF). |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Wed 07/24 9:44 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Civil Cover sheet used, please use the Northern District Courts Civil Cover sheet found on our website. Venue is missing and or unmarked on Civil Cover sheet. No judge assignment will be made until the document is filed. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. [err101] Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc. (kxo, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara. Their case number is 24CV440957. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19650364). Filed by Concentra Health Services, Inc..(Fitzsimmons, Marcie) | |
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
respoth
Answer to Removal Complaint
Wed 07/24 8:07 AM
Answer to Removal Complaint Docket no.1 - (Exhibit B) by Concentra Health Services, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF) |