9
|
|
9
order
Judgment
Thu 08/15 4:51 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 8/15/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 08/15 12:28 PM
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 8/15/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 08/05 5:13 PM
Proof of Service by Audrey L. Kimner(ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Envelope
|
6
|
|
6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 07/31 4:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.
Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2024 at 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (nmc, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 07/24 7:00 PM
Proposed Summons. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 07/24 6:58 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2024 at 1:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/24 6:54 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Audrey L. Kimner. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/24 6:52 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Audrey L. Kimner. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/24 6:48 PM
COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMANDED (no process) against Judge Cameron McGowan Currie, Judge Shiva V. Hodges, (Filing Fee: ifpp entered 7/24/2024). Filed by Audrey L. Kimner. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|