Oden v. Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00987 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 1st JDC, Caddo Parish, 649397 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 5:53 AM CDT |
Defendant
Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Oden
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent
Wed 09/11 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent. If you wish to proceed before the magistrate judge, please complete and return the appropriate form located on this court's website by clicking[LINK:here] . Executed consent forms must be emailed to lawdml_consents@lawd.uscourts.gov. DO NOT return the form to the judges. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
11 | 11
order
Case Management Order - Judges Drell, Doughty, James
Wed 09/11 4:31 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/2/2024.Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/11/2024. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Jurisdictional Review Finding
Mon 08/26 1:16 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/26/2024. (crt,Rider, M) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/13 4:28 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mary Oden. (aty,Nichols, Jason) |
|
Saturday, July 27, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Response to Removal Order
Sat 07/27 9:43 AM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C . (aty,Wolf, Scott) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/26 8:20 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Inc. for Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (aty,Wolf, Scott) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/26 8:18 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (aty,Wolf, Scott) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Removal Order
Thu 07/25 1:51 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/25/2024. (crt,Breite, S) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Thu 07/25 9:05 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/25/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Thu 07/25 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to John Marshall Rice, Scott R Wolf on behalf of Mary Oden, Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 8/8/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Thu 07/25 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Scott R Wolf on behalf of Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/8/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/25 8:28 AM
NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 649,397 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6008022) filed by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C.(Attorney Scott R Wolf added to party Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Wolf, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/25 8:56 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #2 to1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Crick, S) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/25 8:59 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S) |