Zappia v. Morphic Holding, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Donato |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04486 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 8:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Norbert Bischofberger
|
|
Defendant
Gustav Christensen
|
|
Defendant
Martin Edwards
|
|
Defendant
Eli Lilly and Company
|
|
Defendant
Susannah Gray
|
|
Defendant
Morphic Holding, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Nisha Nanda
|
|
Defendant
Amir Nashat
|
|
Defendant
Rainier Acquisition Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Joseph P. Slattery
|
|
Defendant
Timothy Springer
|
|
Defendant
Praveen Tipirneni
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Zappia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/06 9:06 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Juan Monteverde. (lrc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Mon 08/05 4:21 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion For preliminary injunction(Bower, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Supplemental Disclosures | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/05 3:21 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff's renewed motion to shorten time, Dkt. No. 11, is granted. For plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, Dkt. No. 4, a response is due by August 9, 2024; a reply may be filed by August 12, 2024; and a hearing is set for August 15, 2024, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 11, San Francisco. Plaintiff is directed to promptly notify defendants of this order by emailing their counsel. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/5/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Sunday, August 04, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Sun 08/04 8:50 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Juan Monteverde ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19689918.) filed by Joseph Zappia.(Monteverde, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Juan Monteverde | ||
12 | 12
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Sun 08/04 8:10 AM
Declaration of Juan E. Monteverde in Support of11 Amended MOTION to Shorten Time filed byJoseph Zappia. (Bower, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Shorten Time
Sun 08/04 8:04 AM
Amended MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Joseph Zappia.(Bower, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 08/01 5:43 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for expedited discovery and to shorten time, Dkt. No. 2, is denied. The motion was not accompanied by a stipulation or an explanation of any efforts to obtain a stipulation, as is required under Civil Local Rules 6-3(a)(2) and 7-11(a). There is also no indication on the docket that defendants have been served, or that the motion papers were delivered to defendants on the day the papers were filed. See Civil L.R. 7-11(a); Dkt. No. 2 at 11 (certificate of service suggesting papers were "sent" to putative defense counsel by mail). Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/1/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 11:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Morphic Holding, Inc. (lsk, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 07/25 2:55 PM
Proposed Summons. (Bower, David) |
|
7 | 7
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 07/25 2:31 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor.(far, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
6 | 6
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/25 2:17 PM
Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Thu 07/25 12:13 PM
Declaration of David E. Bower in Support of4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,2 MOTION to Expedite and to Shorten Time filed byJoseph Zappia. (Bower, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Morphic Recommendation Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Order in GAN Limited | ||
4 | 4
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Thu 07/25 12:02 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joseph Zappia. Responses due by 8/8/2024. Replies due by 8/15/2024.(Bower, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 07/25 12:01 PM
Proposed Order re2 MOTION to Expedite and to Shorten Time by Joseph Zappia. (Bower, David) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Expedite
Thu 07/25 11:47 AM
MOTION to Expedite and to Shorten Time filed by Joseph Zappia. (Bower, David) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/25 7:55 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19656610.). Filed by Joseph Zappia.(Bower, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration PSLRA Certification |