Ramirez v. Meta Platforms Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04485 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 8:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Instagram, LLC
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Defendant
Meta Platforms Inc.
One Hacker Way
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Defendant
Siculus, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Paul Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/30 3:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms Inc., Siculus, Inc.. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 07/29 2:52 PM
Proposed Summons. (Paulos, Emanuella) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 07/29 7:19 AM
Proposed Summons. (Paulos, Emanuella) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 07/29 2:37 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Please only put on Summons parties that are named in Complaint. TicTok, Bytedance, ect are not named in Complaint. Re:3 Proposed Summons filed by Paul Ramirez (msr, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 07/26 5:40 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Please refile Summons as separate ECF entry "Proposed Summons." Please only include named parties on Summons. The summons you have given includes parties not found listed in Complaint.. Re:1 Complaint filed by Paul Ramirez (msr, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
MDL Member Case
Fri 07/26 5:45 PM
DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED:RE: 4:22-md-03047-YGR IN RE: Social Media Adolescent Addiction/Personal Injury Productis Liability Litigation, Opened in California Northern District as Ramirez v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al., 24-cv-04485 YGRcc: JPMDL (msr, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/25 2:13 PM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/25 7:19 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19656529.). Filed by Paul Ramirez.(Paulos, Emanuella) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |