Bates v. Travelers Insurance Co et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | S Maurice Hicks, Jr |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00988 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 1st JDC, Parish of Caddo, 650649 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 5:53 AM CDT |
Defendant
Vacilo Terronez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Consumers County Mutual Insurance Co
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leroy Bates
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Travelers Insurance Co
Terminated: 07/25/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/30 11:17 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vacilo Terronez. (aty,Melerine, Stacey) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/30 11:13 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Vacilo Terronez.(Attorney Stacey Smith Melerine added to party Vacilo Terronez(pty:dft))(aty,Melerine, Stacey) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent
Fri 08/16 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent. If you wish to proceed before the magistrate judge, please complete and return the appropriate form located on this court's website by clicking[LINK:here] . Executed consent forms must be emailed to lawdml_consents@lawd.uscourts.gov. DO NOT return the form to the judges. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Scheduling Conference
Thu 08/15 3:30 PM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2024 10:30 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 9/18/2024. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 9/25/2024. Rule 26 Report due by 9/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/15/2024. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
10 | 10
order
Jurisdictional Review Finding
Thu 08/15 1:46 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/15/2024. (crt,Rider, M) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Disclosure
Wed 08/14 11:57 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Leroy Bates. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/14/2024. (aty,Jackson, Alonzo) Modified on 8/14/2024 to more accurately describe document (Miletello, A) |
|
notice
Notice of Corrective Action
Wed 08/14 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Alonzo P Jackson, Jr on behalf of Leroy Bates regarding9 First MOTION for Disclosure of Diversity Jurisdiction. Action taken: Modified entry to more accurately identify the pleading as Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement. (crt,Miletello, A) |
||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Response to Removal Order
Mon 08/05 11:15 AM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Consumers County Mutual Insurance Co . (aty,Melerine, Stacey) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/01 9:26 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Consumers County Mutual Insurance Co.(aty,Melerine, Stacey) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Removal Order
Fri 07/26 2:23 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/26/2024. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Thu 07/25 1:49 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/25/2024. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Thu 07/25 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Alonzo P Jackson, Jr on behalf of Leroy Bates. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 8/8/2024. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/25 11:09 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Consumers County Mutual Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents Travelers Texas M G A Inc, Travelers Casualty & Surety Co, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc, Travelers Companies Inc for Consumers County Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Melerine, Stacey) Modified docket text on 7/25/2024 (Miletello, A) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/25 11:04 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Consumers County Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Melerine, Stacey) Modified filer on 7/25/2024 (Miletello, A) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/25 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC, Caddo Parish, Case Number 650649; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6008311) filed by Consumers County Mutual Insurance Co incorrectly named as Travelers Insurance Co.(Attorney Stacey Smith Melerine added to party Travelers Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Melerine, Stacey) Modified on 7/25/2024 to remove reference to jury demand since not contained in pleading & modified filer (Miletello, A). Modified on 7/25/2024 (Miletello, A) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Exception, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Signed Stipulation re Damages, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - List of All Consel, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit Declaration of Service, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Consent to Removal | ||
notice
Notice of Corrective Action
Thu 07/25 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Stacey Smith Melerine on behalf of Travelers Insurance Company regarding1 Notice of Removal. Action taken: Modified entry to remove jury demand from docket entry and court's docket since jury demand was not reflected in pleading. (crt,Miletello, A) |
||
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Thu 07/25 1:26 PM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Consumers County Mutual Insurance Co incorrectly named as Travelers Insurance Co answer due 8/1/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Miletello, A) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/25 1:30 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Miletello, A) |