Johnson v. United Services Automobile Association
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | S Maurice Hicks, Jr |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00989 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 26th JDC, Bossier, 169405 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 11:13 AM CDT |
Defendant
United Services Automobile Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Berlin Johnson
207 N Calhoun St
Plain Dealing, LA 71064 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent
Mon 08/26 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent. If you wish to proceed before the magistrate judge, please complete and return the appropriate form located on this court's website by clicking[LINK:here] . Executed consent forms must be emailed to lawdml_consents@lawd.uscourts.gov. DO NOT return the form to the judges. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Scheduling Conference
Mon 08/26 3:07 PM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2024 at 10:30 AM in by phone before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/2/2024. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/9/2024. Rule 26 Report due by 10/9/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/26/2024. (crt,Enkey, R) |
|
11 | 11
order
Jurisdictional Review Finding
Mon 08/26 11:40 AM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/26/2024. (crt,Rider, M) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/23 5:04 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Berlin Johnson. (aty,Sangisetty, Ravi) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/06 12:00 PM
AMENDED DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U S A A General Indemnity Co. (aty,Phillips, Theresa) Modified docket text on 8/6/2024 (Whitener, M) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/01 2:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by U S A A General Indemnity Co.(aty,Phillips, Theresa) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Removal Order
Mon 07/29 3:47 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/29/2024. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Fri 07/26 11:25 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/25/2024. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Fri 07/26 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Ravi Kishan Sangisetty on behalf of Berlin Johnson. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 8/8/2024. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/25 10:37 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Services Automobile Association identifying Corporate Parent USAA General Indemnity Company for United Services Automobile Association. (aty,Phillips, Theresa) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/25 10:35 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Services Automobile Association. (aty,Phillips, Theresa) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/25 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Compliance by United Services Automobile Association re1 Notice of Removal,, (aty,Phillips, Theresa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/25 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC, Bossier Parish, Case Number 169405 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6008356) filed by United Services Automobile Association.(Attorney Theresa Cassidy Phillips added to party United Services Automobile Association(pty:dft))(aty,Phillips, Theresa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Exact Building Estimate, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - LDOI Profile, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Dec Page, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Contents List, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Correspondence, | ||
Att: 8 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 9 Notice of removal to adverse party | ||
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Fri 07/26 11:16 AM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. U S A A General Indemnity Co answer due 8/1/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY:The PDF image can be found inAttachment #2 to Doc1 Notice of Removal (crt,Chavis, J) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/26 11:19 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Chavis, J) |