Urrea v. Synapse Credit, LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Rita F Lin |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04490 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 11:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Synapse Credit, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly K. Urrea
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 08/28 11:45 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 08/28 11:44 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, To extend time for Equifax to answer filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/21 11:02 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly K. Urrea. Synapse Credit, LLC served on 8/9/2024, answer due 8/30/2024. (Schumacher, Kyle) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/21 11:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly K. Urrea. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/9/2024, answer due 8/30/2024. (Schumacher, Kyle) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/25 6:48 PM
Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Synapse Credit, LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 07/25 6:42 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (tn, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/25 12:09 PM
Case assigned to Judge Rita F. Lin. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 07/25 11:01 AM
Proposed Summons.(Schumacher, Kyle) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 07/25 11:00 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Kimberly K. Urrea (Schumacher, Kyle) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/25 10:58 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. Violation of Fair Credit Reporting Act; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $405.00, receipt number ACANDC-19657763.). Filed by Kimberly K. Urrea.(Schumacher, Kyle) Modified on 7/25/2024 (tn, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |