Lodes et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy D Degiusti |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00753 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma County District Court, CJ-24-02626 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 6:01 AM CDT |
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Lodes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Lodes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Entry of Appearance
Wed 08/14 12:32 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Garrett J Reed on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Tue 08/06 9:28 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Morris, Andrew) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 08/06 1:32 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ashley H Leavitt terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/6/2024. (jee) |
|
Sunday, August 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Sun 08/04 6:09 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Leavitt, Ashley) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 08/01 3:35 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer State Farm Fire and Casualty Company answer due 8/8/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/1/2024. (jee) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/31 4:47 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Morris, Andrew) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement - Corporate
Fri 07/26 12:00 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . (Morris, Andrew) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Entry of Appearance
Fri 07/26 8:02 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Levi Benjamin Baker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baker, Levi) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Fri 07/26 7:55 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Ben D Baker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baker, Ben) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Entry of Appearance
Thu 07/25 1:29 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew James Morris on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Morris, Andrew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/25 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2024-2626 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(ekw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Service Packet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - OSCN Docket, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Thu 07/25 1:31 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4482823. (Morris, Andrew) |