Reynolds v. Eischen
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | John R Tunheim |
Referred: | Dulce J Foster |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02956 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Petitioner
Terrell Reynolds
|
|
Respondent
B. Eischen
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 09/06 3:54 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that: (1) Petitioner Terrell Reynolds's habeas petition (ECF No.1 ) be STRICKEN pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; and (2) This action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 9/6/2024.(MEH) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Receipt
Thu 08/08 8:05 PM
RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000762 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Terrell Reynolds. (KMO) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order on Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Tue 08/06 9:43 AM
ORDER denying4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Action required by August 27, 2024. See Order for details. (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 8/6/2024. (MEH) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP)
Fri 08/02 2:29 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Terrell Reynolds.(ABR) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/01 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Hoskins on behalf of B. Eischen.(Hoskins, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter from Clerk's Office re: No Fee or IFP enclosing AO 239
Thu 07/25 1:51 PM
LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Terrell Reynolds (jam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 07/25 1:50 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Terrell Reynolds. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 5th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. (jam) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |